Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Greatest payload carried to a height of 2 000 m |
8 096 kg |
07 Jul 1982 |
Marina Lavrentryvna Popovitch (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4826 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Greatest payload carried to a height of 2 000 m |
8 096 kg |
07 Jul 1982 |
Marina Lavrentryvna Popovitch (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4825 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Greatest mass carried to height of 2 000 m |
24 038 kg |
07 Jul 1982 |
Marina Lavrentryvna Popovitch (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4824 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-3 |
Speed over a straight 15/25 km course |
265.58 km/h |
17 Dec 1982 |
Arthur C. Stifel (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
9772 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
814,44 km/h |
16 Feb 1983 |
Brooke Knapp (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2198 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
775,73 km/h |
17 Feb 1983 |
Brooke Knapp (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2197 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
750,70 km/h |
17 Feb 1983 |
Brooke Knapp (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2196 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
988,89 km/h |
18 Feb 1983 |
Brooke Knapp (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2195 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
883,16 km/h |
26 Feb 1983 |
Brooke Knapp (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2530 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed around the world, Eastbound |
490,51 km/h |
21 Mar 1983 |
Joe Harnish (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
3544 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1c |
Speed over a recognised course |
498,67 km/h |
22 Mar 1983 |
Richard Flohr (FRG) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
13722 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
775,95 km/h |
30 Mar 1983 |
Donald L. Mullin (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
6903 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1b |
Speed over a recognised course |
337,18 km/h |
05 May 1983 |
Robert F. Olszewski (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
12764 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1b |
Speed over a recognised course, round trip |
312,63 km/h |
05 May 1983 |
Robert F. Olszewski (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
12139 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a closed circuit of 1 000 km with 30 000 kg payload |
2 031,55 km/h |
13 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
3970 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a closed circuit of 1 000 km with 20 000 kg payload |
2 031,55 km/h |
13 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
3969 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a closed circuit of 1 000 km with 10 000 kg payload |
2 031,55 km/h |
13 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
3968 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a closed circuit of 1 000 km with 5 000 kg payload |
2 031,55 km/h |
13 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
3967 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Altitude with 30 000 kg payload |
18 200 m |
20 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4160 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Altitude with 25 000 kg payload |
18 200 m |
20 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4159 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Altitude with 15 000 kg payload |
18 200 m |
20 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4157 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Altitude with 10 000 kg payload |
18 200 m |
20 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4156 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a closed circuit of 2 000 km with 30 000 kg payload |
2 012,26 km/h |
20 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4155 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a closed circuit of 2 000 km with 20 000 kg payload |
2 012,26 km/h |
20 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4154 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a closed circuit of 2 000 km with 10 000 kg payload |
2 012,26 km/h |
20 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4153 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a closed circuit of 2 000 km with 5 000 kg payload |
2 012,26 km/h |
20 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4152 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a closed circuit of 2 000 km without payload |
2 012,26 km/h |
20 Jul 1983 |
Serguei Agapov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
4151 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a straight 15/25 km course |
832.12 km/h |
30 Jul 1983 |
Frank Taylor (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
8434 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Altitude in horizontal flight |
9 692.6 m |
01 Oct 1983 |
Stephen A. Oster (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
8473 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1d |
Speed over a recognised course |
220,28 km/h |
13 Oct 1983 |
Spencer Flack (GBR) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
14141 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-3 |
Distance in a straight line |
2 647.63 km |
30 Oct 1983 |
Nikolay Shlykov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
11947 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-2 |
Distance |
2 647,63 km |
31 Oct 1983 |
Nickolai Shlikov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
11992 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
1196.26 km/h |
17 Dec 1983 |
Maurice Eldridge (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
16479 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1c |
Speed over a recognised course |
254,31 km/h |
09 Feb 1984 |
Marie E. McMillan (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
13660 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1c |
Speed over a recognised course |
365,90 km/h |
25 Mar 1984 |
Richard Fenwick (FRA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2595 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1e |
Speed over a recognised course |
447,48 km/h |
06 Apr 1984 |
Robert Thompson (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
1436 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
217,92 km/h |
28 Apr 1984 |
Bernard Bonneval (FRA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
12309 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1c |
Speed over a recognised course |
194,44 km/h |
20 Jun 1984 |
David Wooldridge (GBR) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
13779 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
888,12 km/h |
02 Jul 1984 |
Brooke Knapp (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2528 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
905.40 km/h |
16 Jul 1984 |
Brooke Knapp (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
1329 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
855,72 km/h |
24 Jul 1984 |
Aziz Ojjeh (SUI) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2633 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
816,48 km/h |
24 Jul 1984 |
Aziz Ojjeh (SUI) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2632 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
748,08 km/h |
24 Jul 1984 |
Aziz Ojjeh (SUI) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2631 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
759,60 km/h |
24 Jul 1984 |
Aziz Ojjeh (SUI) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2630 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
677,88 km/h |
24 Jul 1984 |
Aziz Ojjeh (SUI) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2629 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
739,00 km/h |
24 Jul 1984 |
Aziz Ojjeh (SUI) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2628 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
710,28 km/h |
24 Jul 1984 |
Aziz Ojjeh (SUI) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2627 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
718,56 km/h |
24 Jul 1984 |
Aziz Ojjeh (SUI) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2626 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Speed over a recognised course |
714,24 km/h |
24 Jul 1984 |
Aziz Ojjeh (SUI) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
2625 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1c |
Speed over a recognised course |
165,12 km/h |
07 Aug 1984 |
Aki Suokas (FIN) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
13636 |
|
→ |
⌄ |