Powered Aeroplanes |
C |
Altitude |
13 404 m |
16 Sep 1932 |
Cyril Frank Uwins (GBR) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
8224 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C.bis 2nd category 1930-1937 |
Altitude |
3 231 m |
11 Jun 1931 |
Jean De Viscaya (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
11779 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C |
Altitude |
8 761 m |
06 Mar 1931 |
Ruth Nichols (USA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
12228 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1b |
Altitude |
10 281 m |
12 Feb 1984 |
Richard Flohr (FRG) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
1901 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C.bis |
Altitude |
5 535 m |
30 Nov 1923 |
Jean Fernand Laporte (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
11670 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C |
Altitude |
6 700 m |
24 Dec 1919 |
Jean Casale (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
15457 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1a |
Altitude |
8 736 m |
16 Apr 1964 |
Adriano Mantelli (ITA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
9972 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C 1st category 1939-1949 |
Altitude |
7 985 m |
02 Aug 1938 |
Dmitrievitch Fedoseev (URS) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
8406 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C.bis |
Altitude |
1 777 m |
10 Dec 1936 |
Crystal Mowry (USA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
15182 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C 2nd category 1933-1936 |
Altitude |
7 338 m |
24 Sep 1935 |
Maryse Hilsz (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
12218 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1e |
Altitude |
16 637 m |
26 Jun 1988 |
William Benton (USA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
2650 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C.bis |
Altitude |
11 581 m |
04 Jul 1927 |
C. C. Champion (USA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
11751 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1f |
Altitude |
16 093 m |
07 Jul 1983 |
Bermar S. Stillwell (AUS) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
4119 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C |
Altitude |
10 741 m |
05 Sep 1923 |
Joseph Sadi-lecointe (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
8246 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C |
Altitude |
9 520 m |
14 Jun 1919 |
Jean Casale (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
15455 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C |
Altitude |
5610 m |
11 Sep 1912 |
Roland Garros (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
15888 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1c |
Altitude |
15 549 m |
27 Mar 1972 |
Donald R. Wilson (USA) |
ratified - current record |
World |
1383 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1d |
Altitude |
16 128 m |
25 Sep 1961 |
Alexander K. Smirnov (URS) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
14662 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1b |
Altitude |
12 683 m |
22 Oct 2002 |
Bruce Bohannon (USA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
7543 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C.ter |
Altitude |
5 682 m |
29 Jan 1935 |
Harry Richman (USA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
11668 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1k |
Altitude |
10 940 m |
24 Oct 1985 |
Yuri Kourline (URS) |
ratified - current record |
World |
8049 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C 4th category 1929-1937 |
Altitude |
5 193 m |
05 Sep 1929 |
Charles Fauvel (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
8359 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C |
Altitude |
1 600 m |
17 Mar 1914 |
Victor Garaix (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
15449 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1e |
Altitude |
9 963 m |
15 Mar 1972 |
F. M. Tuytjens (GER) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
8092 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
H |
Altitude |
14 040 m |
05 Jan 1971 |
T.L. Lecky-thompson (GBR) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
5545 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1c |
Altitude |
12 972 m |
31 May 1968 |
Jack T. Womack (USA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
1374 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Altitude |
13 513 m |
20 Oct 1967 |
Lubov Oulanova (URS) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
4850 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1d |
Altitude |
11 257 m |
20 Sep 1960 |
Jerrie Cobb (USA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
10284 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1n |
Altitude |
9 170 m |
05 Mar 1991 |
Valery V. Kuneevskii (URS) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
8688 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C 3rd category 1937-1949 |
Altitude |
7 470 m |
16 Mar 1938 |
Karel Brazda (CZE) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
8726 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C 4th category 1937-1949 |
Altitude |
4 935 m |
27 Dec 1937 |
Georgette Lafargue (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
14864 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-3a-08 |
Altitude |
5 457 m |
15 Dec 1988 |
Bernard D'ottreppe (FRA) |
ratified - reclassified after changes in sporting code |
World |
11943 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1e |
Altitude |
16 329 m |
01 Sep 1988 |
Einar K. Enevoldson (USA) |
ratified - current record |
World |
1388 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C 1st category 1933-1937 |
Altitude |
4 990 m |
24 Sep 1934 |
Madeleine Charnaux (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
12276 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C.bis 2nd category 1930-1937 |
Altitude |
5 554 m |
05 May 1934 |
Carina Negrone (ITA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
12163 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-3 |
Altitude |
10 022 m |
04 Jul 1973 |
Charles H. Manning (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
3208 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Altitude |
19 406 m |
04 May 1953 |
Walter Frame Gibb (GBR) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
10323 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C 2nd category 1937-1949 |
Altitude |
6 827 m |
18 Dec 1937 |
Maurice Arnoux (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
8405 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1g |
Altitude |
22 198 m |
18 Apr 1989 |
Ronald R. Williams (USA) |
ratified - current record |
World |
8629 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C 2nd category 1930-1932 |
Altitude |
5 305 m |
12 Apr 1931 |
Reginensi (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
8236 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
N |
Altitude |
12 309 m |
14 May 1999 |
Lyle H. Schaefer (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
6104 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1j |
Altitude |
9 450 m |
13 May 1982 |
Marina Lavrentryvna Popovitch (URS) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
3350 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1b |
Altitude |
4 481 m |
06 Sep 2013 |
William M. Yates (USA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
16926 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C |
Altitude |
4 860 m |
05 May 1919 |
Lucien Bossoutrot (FRA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
15460 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1e |
Altitude |
14 419 m |
15 Jun 1981 |
Joachim H. Blumschein (GER) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
3376 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C |
Altitude |
3 494 m |
26 Dec 1910 |
Archibald Hoxsey (USA) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
15290 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1 |
Altitude |
15 549 m |
27 Mar 1972 |
Donald R. Wilson (USA) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
1384 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-3k |
Altitude |
11 350 m |
04 Sep 2004 |
Konstantin Parkhomenko (RUS) |
ratified - reclassified after changes in sporting code |
World |
9735 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-3 |
Altitude |
12 185 m |
27 Oct 1964 |
Mickail Mikhailov (URS) |
ratified - retired by changes of the sporting code |
World |
11014 |
|
→ |
⌄ |
Powered Aeroplanes |
C-1b |
Altitude |
11 030 m |
09 Jan 1991 |
Peter Urach (AUT) |
ratified - superseded since approved |
World |
1900 |
|
→ |
⌄ |